NC H596 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-471
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-471
Summary
Allow In-Home Lic'd Barbering.
Title
Allow In-Home Lic'd Barbering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-471 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-07 | Com Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-08-07 | Com Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-13 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-04-13 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Placed On Cal For 4/8/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-01 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H596 |