NC H628 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Development Ready Jobs Study
Title
Development Ready Jobs Study
Sponsors
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Susan Hamilton [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Margaret Jeffus [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-17 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-05-17 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-06 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S545 (Same As) 2011-04-12 - Ref To Com On Finance