NC H637 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Ch. SL 2012-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Ch. SL 2012-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption Law Changes
Title
Adoption Law Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-06 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Ch. SL 2012-16 | |
2012-06-11 | Signed By Gov. 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-08 | Pres. To Gov. 6/8/2012 | |
2012-06-07 | Ratified | |
2012-06-06 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-05 | Postponed To 6/6/2012 | |
2012-06-04 | Placed On Cal For 6/5/2012 | |
2012-06-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-04 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-05-31 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-05-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-05-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-26 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-04-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-25 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-20 | Placed On Cal For 4/21/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Filed |