NC H648 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Vote Centers for Second Primaries
Title
Vote Centers for Second Primaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - A1 Michaux Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - A1 Michaux Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-02 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2013 |
2013-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-10 | House | Ref To Com On Elections |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-09 | House | Filed |