NC H655 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
NC Health Care for Working Families
Title
NC Health Care for Working Families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-09-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-09-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2019-09-11 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-09 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-07-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-09 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-07-09 | House | Serial Referral To Insurance Stricken |
2019-07-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Filed |