NC H66 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-30 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-30 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Summary
New Hanover Annexation Moratorium.
Title
New Hanover Annexation Moratorium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-30 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-12 | Sequentially referred to Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-02-05 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H66 |