NC H661 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-17 - Ch. SL 2009-321
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-17 - Ch. SL 2009-321
Summary
City Managers on School Boards.
Title
City Managers on School Boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-17 | Ch. SL 2009-321 | |
2009-07-17 | Signed By Gov. 7/17/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Pres. To Gov. 7/14/2009 | |
2009-07-13 | Ratified | |
2009-07-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2009-05-13 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H661 |