NC H661 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Innocent Spouse Tax Relief
Title
Innocent Spouse Tax Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-05-31 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/30/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-05-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |