NC H668 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Ch. Res 2015-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Ch. Res 2015-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Remembering the Holocaust
Title
Remembering the Holocaust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Ch. Res 2015-6 | |
2015-04-30 | Ratified | |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-04-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-14 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |