NC H685 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-14 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-14 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Amend On-Site Wastewater Contractor Laws.
Title
Amend On-Site Wastewater Contractor Laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S706 (Same As) 2011-04-20 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H685 |