NC H685 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-20 - Ch. SL 2021-159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-20 - Ch. SL 2021-159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Transaction Fees/Official Fees
Title
Electronic Transaction Fees/Official Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Strickland [R] | Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Destin Hall [R] |
Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] | Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-20 | Ch. SL 2021-159 | |
2021-09-20 | Signed by Gov. 9/20/2021 | |
2021-09-10 | Pres. To Gov. 9/10/2021 | |
2021-09-09 | Ratified | |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/11/2021 |
2021-05-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Commerce
Consumer Credit
Consumer Protection
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Services
Information Technology
Internet
Loans
Presented
Public
Ratified
Teleservices
Commerce
Consumer Credit
Consumer Protection
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Services
Information Technology
Internet
Loans
Presented
Public
Ratified
Teleservices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
25A | 10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
25A | 15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 177.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |