NC H708 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require Criminal BGC/Pharmacist Licensure
Title
Require Criminal BGC/Pharmacist Licensure
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Brenden Jones [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Charles Graham [D] | Rep. Yvonne Holley [D] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-20 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2017-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S104 (Same As) 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-144