NC H721 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Counties/Semiannual Assessment Payments
Title
Counties/Semiannual Assessment Payments
Sponsors
Rep. Nasif Majeed [D] | Sen. Kandie Smith [D] | Rep. Zack Forde-Hawkins [D] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] |
Rep. Johnnie Autry [D] | Rep. Amber Baker [D] | Sen. Rachel Hunt [D] | Rep. Carolyn Logan [D] |
Rep. Raymond Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-09-24 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-09-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-09-23 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-09-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-09-23 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-09-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On State Government |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 199 | (n/a) | Citation Text |