NC H739 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Update Reqs./Advance Health Care Directives
Title
Update Reqs./Advance Health Care Directives
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] | Rep. Johnnie Autry [D] | Rep. Carla Cunningham [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Joe John [D] | Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R] | Rep. Marcia Morey [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2023-05-02 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S147 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Council Of State
Electronic Government
Information Technology
Internet
Power Of Attorney
Public
Public Officials
Secretary Of State
Electronic Government
Information Technology
Internet
Power Of Attorney
Public
Public Officials
Secretary Of State
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
130A | 466 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 468 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
32A | 16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
32A | 25.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 321 | (n/a) | Citation Text |