NC H755 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Travel Insurance Amendments
Title
Travel Insurance Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Ch. SL 2019-128 | |
2019-07-19 | Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019 | |
2019-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2019 | |
2019-07-09 | Ratified | |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Filed |