NC H77 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-25 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-25 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
Regulation of Golf Carts in Camden County.
Title
Regulation of Golf Carts in Camden County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-25 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-02-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-09 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H77 |