NC H80 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Summary
Municipal District Elections 2011/Census.
Title
Municipal District Elections 2011/Census.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-07 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Cal For 4/6/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-09 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S38 (Same As) 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-414
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H80 |