NC H814 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on November 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Ch. SL 2021-179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on November 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Ch. SL 2021-179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Neighborhood Occupantless Vehicle
Title
Neighborhood Occupantless Vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-03 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | Ch. SL 2021-179 | |
2021-11-10 | Signed by Gov. 11/10/2021 | |
2021-11-05 | Pres. To Gov. 11/5/2021 | |
2021-11-04 | Ratified | |
2021-11-03 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-03 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-11-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/03/2021 |
2021-11-02 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-11-02 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Commerce
Emerging Technologies
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Public
Ratified
Self-driving Vehicles
Shipping
Commerce
Emerging Technologies
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Public
Ratified
Self-driving Vehicles
Shipping
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 121.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 4.01 | (n/a) | Citation Text |