NC H816 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Study Biomanufacturing
Title
Study Biomanufacturing
Sponsors
Rep. Donna White [R] | Rep. Robert Reives [D] | Rep. Holly Grange [R] | Rep. Carolyn Logan [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Raymond Smith [D] | Rep. Rena Turner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |