NC H822 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dropout Recovery Pilot Program
Title
Dropout Recovery Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-259 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |