NC H832 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
LRC Study/Nonattorney Ownership/PC Law Firms
Title
LRC Study/Nonattorney Ownership/PC Law Firms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - House - Second Reading\M8 Re-Refer\Judiciary A (Y: 87 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - Second Reading\M3 To Lay On\The Table/Re-R\efer Jud. A (Y: 26 N: 87 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-06-06 - House - Second Reading\M3 To Lay On\The Table/Re-R\efer Jud. A (Y: 26 N: 87 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-06 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-06-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-03 | Placed On Cal For 6/3/2011 | |
2011-06-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S254 (Same As) 2011-03-21 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate