NC H833 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor State Capitol
Title
Honor State Capitol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Placed On Cal For 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |