NC H837 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-26 - Ch. SL 2012-197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-26 - Ch. SL 2012-197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Completion of CPR by Students Required
Title
Completion of CPR by Students Required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-26 | Ch. SL 2012-197 | |
2012-07-26 | Signed By Gov. 7/26/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-29 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-29 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-20 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-06-20 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-02 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-06-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-02 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-31 | Placed On Cal For 6/1/2011 | |
2011-05-31 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-31 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |