NC H855 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-20)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Human Trafficking
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013 |
2013-05-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Filed |