NC H877 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Check Off Donation: Government Funding
Title
Check Off Donation: Government Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-23 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-23 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-19 | Placed On Cal For 5/23/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-03 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-05-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-02 | Filed |