NC H971 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Ch. SL 2024-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Ch. SL 2024-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Human Trafficking Changes
Title
Human Trafficking Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Ch. SL 2024-26 | |
2024-06-28 | Signed by Gov. 6/28/2024 | |
2024-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2024 | |
2024-06-27 | Ratified | |
2024-06-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-26 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2024-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2024 |
2024-06-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-06-24 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-06-20 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2024-06-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-12 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-06-12 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2024-05-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-05-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-05-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Administration Dept.
Aoc
Appropriations
Budgeting
Chaptered
Chief Information Officer
Child Custody
Commissions
Computers
Courts
Crime Victims Compensation Comn.
Crimes
Dhhs
Education
Employment
Family Issues
Food Services
Foods & Beverages
Government Employees
Hotels & Motels
Human Trafficking
Human Trafficking Comn.
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Judicial Dept.
Labor Dept.
Minors
Obscenity
Personnel
Presented
Prostitution
Public
Public Records
Ratified
Records
Smuggling & Trafficking
State Employees
Victims Rights
Vocational Education
Aoc
Appropriations
Budgeting
Chaptered
Chief Information Officer
Child Custody
Commissions
Computers
Courts
Crime Victims Compensation Comn.
Crimes
Dhhs
Education
Employment
Family Issues
Food Services
Foods & Beverages
Government Employees
Hotels & Motels
Human Trafficking
Human Trafficking Comn.
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Judicial Dept.
Labor Dept.
Minors
Obscenity
Personnel
Presented
Prostitution
Public
Public Records
Ratified
Records
Smuggling & Trafficking
State Employees
Victims Rights
Vocational Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
122A | 22.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
130A | 511 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 205.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 43.17 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 456 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 456.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 805 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15B | 2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
42A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
42A | 39 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
50 | 13.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
74G | 2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |