NC H975 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Promote Local/Healthy Food
Title
Promote Local/Healthy Food
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A1 Bradley\Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - A1 Bradley\Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2012-06-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-19 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-18 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-18 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-13 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-17 | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services | |
2012-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Filed |