NC H984 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Removal of Squatters from Private Property
Title
Removal of Squatters from Private Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - A1 Bradford Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - A1 Bradford Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2024-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2024-06-26 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2024-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2024-06-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-05-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-05-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aoc
Civil Actions
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Emergency Services
Judicial Dept.
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Property
Public
Real Estate
Sheriffs
Trespassing
Civil Actions
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Emergency Services
Judicial Dept.
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Property
Public
Real Estate
Sheriffs
Trespassing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 79 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
42 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
42 | 80 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
42 | 81 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
42 | 82 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
42 | 84 | (n/a) | Citation Text |