NC H985 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement Technical Corrections Act of 2018.-AB
Title
Retirement Technical Corrections Act of 2018.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Dulin [R] | Rep. Stephen Ross [R] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] |
Rep. Joe John [D] | Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Ch. SL 2018-85 | |
2018-06-25 | Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Ratified | |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-05 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/05/2018 |
2018-05-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-05-31 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-05-23 | House | Ref To Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-22 | House | Filed |