NC S162 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Ch. Res 2015-12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Ch. Res 2015-12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Dan Simpson, Former Member
Title
Honor Dan Simpson, Former Member
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Ch. Res 2015-12 | |
2015-08-13 | Ratified | |
2015-08-12 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-08-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-12 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-08-12 | House | Cal Pursuant 32 |
2015-08-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-08-12 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2015-08-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-08-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/12/2015 |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Filed |