NC S163 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reclaimed Water as a Source Water
Title
Reclaimed Water as a Source Water
Sponsors
Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. William Cook [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] |
Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Michael Walters [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - M6 Reconsider C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - House - A1 Wells Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - M6 Reconsider C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - House - A1 Wells Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Ch. SL 2014-113 | |
2014-08-06 | Signed by Gov. 8/6/2014 | |
2014-08-01 | Pres. To Gov. 08/01/2014 | |
2014-08-01 | Ratified | |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Conf Rept Withdrawn |
2014-07-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Rpt Withdrawn |
2014-07-31 | House | Reconsidered Adoption |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/31/2014 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/30/2014 |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-24 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-24 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/28/2014 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/25/2014 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-15 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-14 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Senate Fail to Concur - No Appt Message Sent To House |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2014 |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-06-23 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-19 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-06-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-19 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2014 |
2014-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed |