NC S168 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Ch. SL 2018-40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Ch. SL 2018-40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
AOC Omnibus Changes
Title
AOC Omnibus Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A2 Turner, R. Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A2 Turner, R. Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Ch. SL 2018-40 | |
2018-06-22 | Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Ratified | |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2018-06-13 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-13 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-06-13 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A1 |
2018-06-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2018 |
2018-06-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2018-06-04 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2018-05-31 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2017-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/27/2017 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Filed |