NC S195 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-407
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-407
Summary
Preparations for Aging Baby Boomers.
Title
Preparations for Aging Baby Boomers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | Ch. SL 2009-407 | |
2009-08-05 | Signed By Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Pres. To Gov. 7/28/2009 | |
2009-07-27 | Ratified | |
2009-07-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-21 | Placed On Cal For 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-25 | Re-ref Com On Education | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-10 | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Education | |
2009-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-18 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H273 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S195 |