NC S20 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Ch. SL 2023-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Ch. SL 2023-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Care for Women, Children, and Families Act
Title
Care for Women, Children, and Families Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Sen. Paul Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - House - Veto Override (Y: 72 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Motion 12 Objection to Consideration (Y: 46 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-03 - House - M8 Re-Refer Conf. Com. w/ Instructions (Y: 46 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-03 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 71 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Motion 12 Objection to Consideration (Y: 46 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-03 - House - M8 Re-Refer Conf. Com. w/ Instructions (Y: 46 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-03 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 71 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Ch. SL 2023-14 | |
2023-05-16 | House | Veto Overridden |
2023-05-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-16 | House | Veto Received from Senate |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Veto Overridden |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/16/2023 |
2023-05-14 | Vetoed 05/14/2023 | |
2023-05-04 | Pres. To Gov. 5/4/2023 | |
2023-05-04 | Ratified | |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-05-03 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/04/2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2023-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2023-05-02 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-02 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2023-05-02 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2023-04-05 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-14 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-13 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Abortion
Adoption
Appropriations
Budgeting
Chaptered
Child Abuse
Child Custody
Clinics
Commerce
Commissions
Confidentiality
Controlled Substances
Courts
Crimes
Day Care
Definitions
Dhhs
Domestic Violence
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Employment
Family Issues
Fines & Penalties
Foster Care
Government Employees
Health Education
Health Services
Hospitals
Human Resources Comn.
Information Technology
Inmates
Internet
Leave
Lgbtq & Gender Issues
Licenses & Permits
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Mental Health
Minors
Monitoring & Surveillance Systems
Newborns & Infants
Notification
Occupations
Parole & Probation
Personnel
Pharmaceuticals
Physicians
Pregnancy
Presented
Privacy
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Reporting
Salaries & Benefits
Sentencing
Sex Offenses
Social Services
Social Services Depts.
State Employees
Teleservices
Title Change
Veto Overridden
Vetoed
Women
Adoption
Appropriations
Budgeting
Chaptered
Child Abuse
Child Custody
Clinics
Commerce
Commissions
Confidentiality
Controlled Substances
Courts
Crimes
Day Care
Definitions
Dhhs
Domestic Violence
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Employment
Family Issues
Fines & Penalties
Foster Care
Government Employees
Health Education
Health Services
Hospitals
Human Resources Comn.
Information Technology
Inmates
Internet
Leave
Lgbtq & Gender Issues
Licenses & Permits
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Mental Health
Minors
Monitoring & Surveillance Systems
Newborns & Infants
Notification
Occupations
Parole & Probation
Personnel
Pharmaceuticals
Physicians
Pregnancy
Presented
Privacy
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Reporting
Salaries & Benefits
Sentencing
Sex Offenses
Social Services
Social Services Depts.
State Employees
Teleservices
Title Change
Veto Overridden
Vetoed
Women