NC S207 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Various Raise the Age Changes/JJAC Recs
Title
Various Raise the Age Changes/JJAC Recs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - House - A1 Morey Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2021-08-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - House - A1 Morey Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2021-08-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-30 | Ch. SL 2021-123 | |
2021-08-30 | Signed by Gov. 8/30/2021 | |
2021-08-26 | Pres. To Gov. 8/26/2021 | |
2021-08-25 | Ratified | |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/24/2021 |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-08-19 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-08-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-18 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2021-08-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-06-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-31 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H252 (Same As) 2022-07-11 - Ch. SL 2022-73
Subjects
Attorneys
Chaptered
Child Custody
Correctional Institutions
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
District Attorneys
Emergency Services
Family Issues
Institutionalized Persons
Juvenile Code
Juvenile Institutions
Local Government
Minors
Presented
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Sentencing
Social Services
Social Services Depts.
Chaptered
Child Custody
Correctional Institutions
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
District Attorneys
Emergency Services
Family Issues
Institutionalized Persons
Juvenile Code
Juvenile Institutions
Local Government
Minors
Presented
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Sentencing
Social Services
Social Services Depts.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143B | 805 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 806 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 811 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 831 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 853 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
7A | 271 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
7B | 101 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1501 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1601 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1602 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1700 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1701 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1702 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1703 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1706 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1706.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1902 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 1906 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2102 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2200.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2204 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2502 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2513 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2514 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2516 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2600 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2710 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2711 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2712 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2713 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 3100 | (n/a) | Citation Text |