NC S229 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - Ch. SL 2012-200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - Ch. SL 2012-200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Environmental Laws 2012
Title
Amend Environmental Laws 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-06-28 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-06-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - A9 Gillespie\Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A8 LaRoque\Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A7 Samuelson\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A6 Stam\Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A5 Gillespie\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - A3 Moffitt\Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - A2 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - A1 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-06-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - A9 Gillespie\Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A8 LaRoque\Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A7 Samuelson\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A6 Stam\Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A5 Gillespie\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - A3 Moffitt\Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - A2 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - A1 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Ch. SL 2012-200 | |
2012-08-01 | Signed By Gov. 8/1/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Ratified | |
2012-07-03 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-07-03 | Placed On Cal For 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-07-02 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-07-02 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-28 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-21 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-20 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-20 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-18 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-18 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-18 | Amend Adopted 9 | |
2012-06-14 | Amendment 9 Offered | |
2012-06-13 | Amend Adopted 8 | |
2012-06-13 | Amend Adopted 7 | |
2012-06-13 | Amend Adopted 6 | |
2012-06-13 | Amend Adopted 5 | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Amendment Withdrawn 4 | |
2012-06-12 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-06-12 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-12 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-11 | Placed On Cal For 6/12/2012 | |
2012-06-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-11-07 | Re-ref Com On Environment | |
2011-11-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-09 | Ref To Com On Appropriations | |
2011-05-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-03 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-08 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2011-03-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |