NC S231 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-28 - Failed Concur In Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-28 - Failed Concur In Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporation/ETJ Study
Title
Incorporation/ETJ Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 | |
2012-06-20 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-20 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-19 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2012-06-11 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-11 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-11 | Postponed To 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-30 | Re-ref Com On Government | |
2012-05-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On Environment | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-08 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2011-03-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |