NC S252 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
North Carolina Teaching Fellows
Title
North Carolina Teaching Fellows
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H339 (Same As) 2017-03-28 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations