NC S256 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Ch. SL 2015-82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Ch. SL 2015-82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Durham Voluntary Annexations/Adjacent Streets
Title
Durham Voluntary Annexations/Adjacent Streets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Ch. SL 2015-82 | |
2015-06-18 | Ratified | |
2015-06-17 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-28 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2015-05-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-05-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/26/2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Filed |