NC S262 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Recovery of Bill of Rights
Title
Honor Recovery of Bill of Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 03/18/2013 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Filed |