NC S27 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-18 - Ch. SL 2011-173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-18 - Ch. SL 2011-173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local Annexations Subject to 60% Petition
Title
Local Annexations Subject to 60% Petition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Senate - House Amd\Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A1 LaRoque\Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A1 LaRoque\Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-18 | Ch. SL 2011-173 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-17 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2011-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-16 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-09 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-03 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Placed On Cal For 3/3/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-23 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-02-23 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-02-22 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-16 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-02-16 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-02-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-03 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-02-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-02 | Filed |