NC S284 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Ch. SL 2015-121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Ch. SL 2015-121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Infrastructure Assessments/Extend Sunset
Title
Infrastructure Assessments/Extend Sunset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Ch. SL 2015-121 | |
2015-06-29 | Signed by Gov. 6/29/2015 | |
2015-06-25 | Pres. To Gov. 06/25/2015 | |
2015-06-25 | Ratified | |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Concurred In H Amend S284v2 |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2015 |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Amend |
2015-06-23 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-22 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |