NC S290 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-03 - Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-03 - Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waynesville Annexation
Title
Waynesville Annexation
Sponsors
Sen. James Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2013-05-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-17 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-16 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H306 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance