NC S315 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-04 - Ch. SL 2011-408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-04 - Ch. SL 2011-408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Roadside Campaign Signs
Title
Roadside Campaign Signs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-28 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-07-28 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 68 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 65 N: 41 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-28 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 68 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 65 N: 41 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-04 | Ch. SL 2011-408 | |
2011-08-04 | Signed By Gov. 8/4/2011 | |
2011-07-28 | Pres. To Gov. 7/28/2011 | |
2011-07-28 | Ratified | |
2011-07-28 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2011-07-28 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2011-07-27 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2011 | |
2011-07-27 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-07-27 | Placed On Cal For 7/28/2011 | |
2011-07-27 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-06-18 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-06-17 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-06-17 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2011-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-07 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-18 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-18 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-18 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-14 | Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2011-03-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |