NC S338 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disaster Recovery Act of 2017
Title
Disaster Recovery Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A1 Bell, J. Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A1 Bell, J. Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | Ch. SL 2017-119 | |
2017-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-06-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-06-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Filed |