NC S382 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Ch. SL 2016-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Ch. SL 2016-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revision of SB 612
Title
Revision of SB 612
Sponsors
Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Kathryn Harrington [R] | Sen. Wesley Meredith [R] | Sen. Joel Ford [D] |
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Ch. SL 2016-14 | |
2016-06-16 | Ratified | |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-15 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-13 | House | Serial Referral To Regulatory Reform Stricken |
2015-04-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Regulatory Reform |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/27/2015 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Filed |