NC S388 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment Insurance Law Changes - 2
Title
Unemployment Insurance Law Changes - 2
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. William Cook [R] | Sen. Michael Walters [D] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] |
Sen. William Jackson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Agriculture |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Filed |