NC S409 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-09 - Ch. SL 2023-151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-09 - Ch. SL 2023-151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Various Changes to Criminal and Civil Laws
Title
Various Changes to Criminal and Civil Laws
Sponsors
Sen. Danny Britt [R] | Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] | Sen. David Craven [R] | Sen. Ted Alexander [R] |
Sen. Bobby Hanig [R] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Sen. Buck Newton [R] |
Sen. Eddie Settle [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-10-25 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 94 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-09-20 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-09-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 94 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-09-20 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-09-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-09 | Ch. SL 2023-151 | |
2023-11-09 | Signed by Gov. 11/9/2023 | |
2023-10-25 | Pres. To Gov. 10/25/2023 | |
2023-10-25 | Ratified | |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-10-25 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-10-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-10-25 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2023-09-20 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2023-09-20 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-09-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-09-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-09-19 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-09-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-09-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-07-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-07-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-29 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 3, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-01 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H590 (Same As) 2023-04-10 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Advertising & Marketing
Aircraft
Aviation
Boards
Boats & Watercraft
Chaptered
Commerce
Communications
Corporations
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Ngos
Nonprofit
Presented
Public
Railroads
Ratified
Secondary Education
Sentencing
Shipping
Signs
Storage Systems
Theft
Title Change
Transportation
Trucks
Youth Programs
Aircraft
Aviation
Boards
Boats & Watercraft
Chaptered
Commerce
Communications
Corporations
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Ngos
Nonprofit
Presented
Public
Railroads
Ratified
Secondary Education
Sentencing
Shipping
Signs
Storage Systems
Theft
Title Change
Transportation
Trucks
Youth Programs