NC S429 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-28 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-28 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Summary
New Hanover/Energy-Related Incentives.
Title
New Hanover/Energy-Related Incentives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-05 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H963 (Same As) 2009-04-02 - Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S429 |