NC S472 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-20 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-20 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Summary
Annexation Changes.
Title
Annexation Changes.
Sponsors
Sen. Vernon Malone [D] | Sen. Tony Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-20 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-03-10 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H727 (Same As) 2011-04-07 - Ref To Com On Education
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S472 |